Individual Details
Maj Gen Henry Templer
(23 Aug 1796 - 18 Apr 1875)
Henry was baptised at Teigngrace, having been born on 26 August 1796.He died in the Newton Abbot Registration District in 1875. Major General ? India etc.
Ron Lewin - 1983
HEICS Bengal Army Career:
16 Dec 1813. Cadet, at Addiscombe.
16 Dec 1814. Ensign, 4th Native Infantry, Dinapore.
16 June 1816. Lieutenant
1816. Nepal war. 4th Brigade, Centre column. 1st India medal, Taking of Muckwanpur
1 Aug 1818. Lieutenant, 4th Native Infantry. Maharatta Campaign 1817/18 (?) Nepal bar to medal.
May 1824. Lieutenant, 7th Native Infantry. Adjutant 1825-1826. Quartermaster Burma Campaign 1824/25
May 1829. Battalion Captain.??
16 Dec 1829 Brevet Captain
2 Jan 1831 Captain
Jan 1838. Brigade Major, Cawnpore. Furlough March 1842 - Nov 1843.
9 Nov 1846 Brevet Major
Nov 1846. Battalion Major, 7th Native Infantry, Sutlez (1st Sikh War)1846.
6 Nov 1848 Major
7 May 1854 Lt Col
May 1854. Lieutenant Colonel commanding 7th Native Infantry.
7 May 1857 Brevet Colonel
25 July 1857. Regiment mutinied at Dinapore, 43 years after he had joined them!
Jun 1858 Colonel
1858. Transferred to 6th European Infantry
1859. Transferred to 1st European Infantry, Bengal Fusiliers.
August 1859. Retired as a Major General in the Bengal Army.
18 Oct 1859 Hon. Major-General retired from active duties
He was appointed to the 2nd Battalion, 4th Regiment Bengal Native Infantry stationed at Dinapore, and served with it in the campaigns of 1815 and 1816, and was present at the taking of Muckwanpore in Nepaul. He served with his regiment in the Mahratta campaign, in 1817 and 1818. As adjutant to the left wing at the surrender of Jumblepore. As interpreter and quartermaster to his regiment until he obtained his company appointed brigade major at Cawnpore in 1838 and 1839, and was at Ferozepore in 1846. In attaining his majority, he was appointed to the command of the 7th Regiment Bengal Native Infantry in 1840, which he held till the mutiny of the regiment at Dinapore on 27 July 1857
Medals:
Army of India
Nepal Bar
1st Sikh War
Indian Mutiny
Ron Lewin - 1983
HEICS Bengal Army Career:
16 Dec 1813. Cadet, at Addiscombe.
16 Dec 1814. Ensign, 4th Native Infantry, Dinapore.
16 June 1816. Lieutenant
1816. Nepal war. 4th Brigade, Centre column. 1st India medal, Taking of Muckwanpur
1 Aug 1818. Lieutenant, 4th Native Infantry. Maharatta Campaign 1817/18 (?) Nepal bar to medal.
May 1824. Lieutenant, 7th Native Infantry. Adjutant 1825-1826. Quartermaster Burma Campaign 1824/25
May 1829. Battalion Captain.??
16 Dec 1829 Brevet Captain
2 Jan 1831 Captain
Jan 1838. Brigade Major, Cawnpore. Furlough March 1842 - Nov 1843.
9 Nov 1846 Brevet Major
Nov 1846. Battalion Major, 7th Native Infantry, Sutlez (1st Sikh War)1846.
6 Nov 1848 Major
7 May 1854 Lt Col
May 1854. Lieutenant Colonel commanding 7th Native Infantry.
7 May 1857 Brevet Colonel
25 July 1857. Regiment mutinied at Dinapore, 43 years after he had joined them!
Jun 1858 Colonel
1858. Transferred to 6th European Infantry
1859. Transferred to 1st European Infantry, Bengal Fusiliers.
August 1859. Retired as a Major General in the Bengal Army.
18 Oct 1859 Hon. Major-General retired from active duties
He was appointed to the 2nd Battalion, 4th Regiment Bengal Native Infantry stationed at Dinapore, and served with it in the campaigns of 1815 and 1816, and was present at the taking of Muckwanpore in Nepaul. He served with his regiment in the Mahratta campaign, in 1817 and 1818. As adjutant to the left wing at the surrender of Jumblepore. As interpreter and quartermaster to his regiment until he obtained his company appointed brigade major at Cawnpore in 1838 and 1839, and was at Ferozepore in 1846. In attaining his majority, he was appointed to the command of the 7th Regiment Bengal Native Infantry in 1840, which he held till the mutiny of the regiment at Dinapore on 27 July 1857
Medals:
Army of India
Nepal Bar
1st Sikh War
Indian Mutiny
Events
Birth | 23 Aug 1796 | Teigngrace, Devon, England, United Kingdom | |||
Christen | 26 Aug 1796 | Teigngrace, Devon, England, United Kingdom | |||
Military service | 1816 - 1846 | Indian Army | |||
Marriage | 15 Dec 1823 | Cawnpore, India - Emma Frances Fombelle | |||
Residence | 1861 | Age: 64; RelationToHead: Head - St. Helier, Jersey, Channel Islands, United Kingdom | |||
Residence | 1871 | Age: 74; RelationToHead: Head Major General Retired List, Late of the Hon East Indi - Teignmouth, Devon, England, United Kingdom | |||
Death | 18 Apr 1875 | 1 Grove Villas, Teignmouth, Devon, England, United Kingdom | |||
Occupation | Maj Gen - Bengal Army |
Families
Spouse | Emma Frances Fombelle (1801 - 1868) |
Child | Mary Templer ( - 1829) |
Child | Maj Gen Henry John Templer (1826 - 1887) |
Child | Captain John Fombelle Templer (1829 - 1882) |
Child | Fanny Templer (1834 - 1834) |
Child | Fanny Templer (1838 - 1919) |
Child | Sydney Lear Rogers Templer (1843 - 1913) |
Father | Lt Col Henry Line Templer (1763 - 1818) |
Mother | Mary Rogers (1771 - 1851) |
Sibling | Mary Templer (1794 - 1886) |
Sibling | John Line Templer (1795 - 1865) |
Sibling | Jane Templer (1797 - ) |
Sibling | Major George Templer (1798 - 1848) |
Sibling | Louisa Ann Matilda Templer (1801 - 1838) |
Sibling | Emma Templer (1807 - 1869) |
Sibling | Ellen Jane Templer (1809 - 1851) |
Sibling | Captain Frederick R. Templer (1811 - 1871) |