Individual Details
Brig Gen Cyril Frank Templer I.A. CMG CIE
(3 Oct 1869 - 28 Jan 1947)
Was commissioned into the Royal Artillery.
In 1902 founded the Mona Remount Depot in India and was its first Superintendent.
In 1913 was a Major. Is believed to have been at least a full Colonel when he retired from the Army. CRT's records show that he was awarded a CMG and a CIE.
On retirement, settled in Northumberland rather than Devon. A family myth at the time said he wanted to be as far away from his misbehaving Templer relatives as possible. However, his daughter-in-law, in the late 1960s, said that this story was not correct, he merely wanted to live in the same area as his wife's family.
Telephone Directory 1928 - Brigadier General C F Templer, Hawkslaw Coldstream, Leitholm
In 1902 founded the Mona Remount Depot in India and was its first Superintendent.
In 1913 was a Major. Is believed to have been at least a full Colonel when he retired from the Army. CRT's records show that he was awarded a CMG and a CIE.
On retirement, settled in Northumberland rather than Devon. A family myth at the time said he wanted to be as far away from his misbehaving Templer relatives as possible. However, his daughter-in-law, in the late 1960s, said that this story was not correct, he merely wanted to live in the same area as his wife's family.
Telephone Directory 1928 - Brigadier General C F Templer, Hawkslaw Coldstream, Leitholm
Events
Families
Spouse | Harriet Mary Currie (1887 - 1973) |
Child | Joan Holmes Templer (1910 - 2001) |
Child | Capt Donald Philip Templer (1914 - 1965) |
Child | Shelia Grace Templer (1919 - 2005) |
Father | Philip Arthur Templer (1846 - 1899) |
Mother | Frances Grace Layard (1846 - 1932) |
Sibling | Ethel Katherine Templer (1867 - 1957) |
Sibling | Dame Agnes Irene Templer MBE (1871 - 1952) |
Notes
Military
C.M.G. London Gazette 14 January 1916. ‘Lieutenant-Colonel, Indian Army’.C.I.E. London Gazette 3 June 1918. ‘Lieutenant-Colonel (temporary Brigadier-General), C.M.G., Director-General, Army Remount Department.’
M.I.D. London Gazette 1 January 1916.
Cyril Frank Templer was born on 3 October 1867. He was first commissioned into the Royal Artillery in February 1889 before being appointed to the Indian Army in May 1891. Promoted to Lieutenant in February 1892. Posted to the 1st Duke of Connaught’s Own Bombay Lancers in 1894, with whom he served in the Sudan campaign. Seconded for service with the Indian Staff Corps in July 1894. Promoted to a Captain in the Indian Staff Corps, January 1900 and Major in the Indian Army Remount Department in 1907. Promoted to Lieutenant-Colonel in February 1915. Lieutenant-Colonel Templer was appointed Director-General of the Army Remount Department in September 1915 (London Gazette 4 July 1916). For his services with the Remount Department during the war, he was mentioned in despatches, awarded the C.M.G. and C.I.E. and awarded the brevet of Colonel, retiring in 1920. As a Brigadier-General he was recalled during W.W.2 for service as Deputy Controller Air Raid Precautions, Moray and Nairn, and War Office Welfare Officer for Forres, Morayshire.
In 1925 he was President of the Arab Horse Society. Latterly a keen member of the Findhorn Yachting Club. He died in Forres on 28 January 1947, his health having been impaired since the previous Autumn when his yacht capsized in stormy weather in Findhorn Bay.